Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Foix (Jr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes

Cardinal-Deacon of San Sisto

Administrator of Bayonne

Administrator of Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1449BornPau
17 May 147526.2SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
31 Jul 147526.4AppointedBishop of Aire, France
11 Mar 147627.0ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
18 Dec 147627.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 147627.8AppointedAdministrator of Aire, France
15 Jan 147727.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
5 May 148435.2AppointedAdministrator of Bayonne, France
14 May 148536.2AppointedAdministrator of Palermo, Italy
Aug 1485³36.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sisto
6 Jul 148940.4AppointedAdministrator of Malta
10 Aug 149041.5DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Foix (Jr.):
Pierre Cardinal de Foix (Jr.) (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a cardinal for 13.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1476

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015