Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert FitzHugh

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1431AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
16 Sep 1431Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
Dec 1435SelectedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 1436DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Robert FitzHugh:
Bishop Robert FitzHugh (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,456
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 296
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 179
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013