Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Antônio de Figueiredo

Deceased

Bishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1763Born
17 Dec 179128.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Oct 182461.2SelectedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
20 Dec 182461.4ConfirmedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
24 Feb 182561.5Ordained BishopBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal
8 Apr 183874.7DiedBishop of Faro {Algarve}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Antônio de Figueiredo
Bishop Bernardo Antônio de Figueiredo (born , died ) Bishop of Faro {Algarve}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGouveia

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 304
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018