Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Brian Edwin Charles Butterley Ferme

Secretary of the Council for the Economy

Priest of Portsmouth, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1955 Born
2 Feb 198024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
Jan 1993³37.6IncardinatedPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
22 Mar 201458.9AppointedSecretary of the Council for the Economy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Brian Edwin Charles Butterley Ferme
(VIAF: 64326692; WikiData: Q115512905)
Father Brian Edwin Charles Butterley Ferme (born ) Secretary of Economy

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Pirie, Diocese of Port Pirie, Australia
Ordained PriestPort Pirie, Diocese of Port Pirie, Australia

Please contact the Father through the Council for the Economy.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014
  • opd/c1/loc: CL, 27 Jul 2022
  • mn: CB, 8 Nov 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 22 May 2023