Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Frédéric Cardinal de Falloux du Coudray

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1815BornBourg d'Iré, France
12 Mar 187761.6Elevated to Cardinal
20 Mar 187761.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
12 May 187963.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
22 Jun 188468.9DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Frédéric de Falloux du Coudray:
Cardinal Frédéric de Falloux du Coudray (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 7.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013