Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Fageda, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1608³BornVich, Spain
21 Jun 166051.7AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Jul 166455.8AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
May 1685³76.6DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Fageda:
Bishop José Fageda O.S.H. (born ) Bishop of Tortosa

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 194
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 192, Number 1,207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013