Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Agostino Cardinal Fabroni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1651BornPistoia, Italy
17 May 170654.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170654.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
19 Sep 172776.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

MicroData Summary for Carlo Agostino Fabroni:
Cardinal Carlo Agostino Fabroni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino

  • a cardinal for 21.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013