Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Erdozainey-Etchart, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Superior of Tali [Dali], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1883Born
190420.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
191026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
18 Jun 193046.5AppointedSuperior of Tali [Dali], China
12 May 193147.4DiedSuperior of Tali [Dali], China

MicroData Summary for Pierre Erdozainey-Etchart
Father Pierre Erdozainey-Etchart S.C.I. (born , died ) Superior of Tali [Dali]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarceveau, Diocese of Bayonne, France

  • a priest for 21.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast