Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich von Eickstedt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kammin (Camin), Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1330AppointedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
30 Sep 1330Ordained BishopBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
1343¹ResignedBishop of Kammin (Camin), Germany
6 Dec 1343DiedBishop Emeritus of Kammin (Camin), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Eickstedt (VIAF: 80439442)
Bishop Friedrich von Eickstedt (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kammin (Camin)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,733
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 162
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Apr 2019

Quantcast