Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Pierre Duhart, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Jilin [Kirin], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1901Born
8 Nov 191917.9ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 192524.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
1946²44.0AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Jilin [Kirin], China
1952²50.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jilin [Kirin], China
16 Aug 196361.6DiedApostolic Administrator of Jilin [Kirin], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Duhart
Father Pierre Duhart M.E.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Jilin [Kirin]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa-Bastide-Clairence, Diocese of Bayonne, France
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 37.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast