Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pascal Dufour

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Sep 1467AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
4 Oct 1467Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
29 Jan 1483DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Pascal Dufour
Bishop Pascal Dufour (died ) Bishop of Pamiers

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Blaise, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 90
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,493
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1467, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast