Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Girolamo Landi

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1458AppointedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
9 Mar 1474AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1493¹ResignedArchbishop of Candia {Crete}, Greece
16 Oct 1493DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Landi
Patriarch Girolamo Landi (died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139, and Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,458, Number 15*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast