Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hector d’Ossun

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1549AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
27 Jul 1550Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
30 Sep 1574DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

MicroData Summary for Hector d’Ossun
Bishop Hector d’Ossun (died ) Bishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. André, Monastery, Villeneuve les Avignon

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018