Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Nicola de Massa

Deceased

Bishop of Venafro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 May 1644Born
25 Jul 166925.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 Jul 166925.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 169046.5AppointedBishop of Venafro, Italy
23 Mar 171065.8DiedBishop of Venafro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Nicola de Massa
Bishop Carlo Nicola de Massa (born , died ) Bishop of Venafro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMortola

  • a priest for 40.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 407
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018