Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John de la Ware, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1253AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
11 Jan 1254Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
30 Jun 1256DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John de la Ware
Bishop John de la Ware O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 243
  • ocist: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,570

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast