Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Ignaz Dlouhovesky

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

Titular Bishop of Milevum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1638BornPraha
21 Dec 166123.9Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
10 Apr 167941.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
10 Apr 167941.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Milevum
11 Jun 167941.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Milevum
10 Jan 170162.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Ignaz Dlouhovesky:
Bishop Johann Ignaz Dlouhovesky (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha {Prague}

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013