Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso de la Cerda, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1578AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
6 Nov 1587AppointedBishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia
25 Jun 1592DiedBishop of La Plata o Charcas, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de la Cerda
Bishop Alfonso de la Cerda O.P. (died ) Bishop of La Plata o Charcas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 90, Number 552
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173, and Page 152
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018