Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspert de Laval

Deceased

Archbishop of Narbonne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Sep 1319AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
10 Dec 1319Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
26 Aug 1323AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
1 Oct 1341AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
1 Jan 1347DiedArchbishop of Narbonne, France

MicroData Summary for Gaspert de Laval
Archbishop Gaspert de Laval (died ) Archbishop of Narbonne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 330, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 356
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast