Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Díaz de Coca

Deceased

Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1467AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
3 Jul 1468Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
1469¹ResignedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
13 Feb 1470AppointedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
12 Mar 1477DiedBishop of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Díaz de Coca
Bishop Juan Díaz de Coca (died ) Bishop of Calahorra y La Calzada

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 209, and Page 114
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,498
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 308, Number 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1468, Number 4
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast