Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Jean d’Harcourt

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateEventTitle
1418AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
Dec 1418InstalledBishop of Amiens, France
Oct 1419²Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
4 Mar 1433AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
22 Apr 1433AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
5 Nov 1436AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
1439InstalledArchbishop of Narbonne, France
10 Dec 1451AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
1452DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Harcourt:
Patriarch Jean d’Harcourt Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

  • a bishop for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013