Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Val

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Apr 1587AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
18 Oct 1587Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
28 Oct 1595DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Val
Archbishop Francisco de Val (died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCogolludo, Diocese of Sigüenza, Spain
Ordained BishopLa Seo, Cathedral, Zaragoza, Archdiocese of Zaragoza, Spain
Death PlaceCagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,492
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 99, Number 620
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018