Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François d’Estaing

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez, France


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Oct 1504AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
31 Aug 1505Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
1 Nov 1529DiedBishop of Rodez, France

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for François d’Estaing
Bishop François d’Estaing (died ) Bishop of Rodez

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018