Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Maria d’Este

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
31 May 1487AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
12 Aug 1487Ordained BishopBishop of Adria, Italy
5 Aug 1507DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Maria d’Este (VIAF: 84967553)
Bishop NicolÚ Maria d’Este (died ) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ferrara, Diocese of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1487, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast