Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Estampes

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1445Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
29 May 1446InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
15 Jan 1448AppointedBishop of Nevers, France
24 Dec 1461DiedBishop of Nevers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Estampes
Bishop Jean d’Estampes (died ) Bishop of Nevers

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 204
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,749

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast