Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Deplano

Deceased

Bishop of Iglesias, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1712Born
17 Dec 173523.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
26 May 173624.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Aug 177462.3SelectedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
13 Mar 177562.9ConfirmedBishop of Iglesias, Italy
13 Apr 177563.0Ordained BishopBishop of Iglesias, Italy
1781¹68.7DiedBishop of Iglesias, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Deplano
Bishop Francesco Antonio Deplano (born , died 1781) Bishop of Iglesias

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaulis

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 204
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,051
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,775, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast