Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano d’Elia

Deceased

Titular Bishop of DorylaŽum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1755BornCasamassima, Italy
13 Jun 177823.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 181863.0AppointedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum
7 Apr 182266.8DiedTitular Bishop of DorylaŽum

MicroData Summary for Stefano d’Elia
Bishop Stefano d’Elia (born , died ) Titular Bishop of DorylaŽum

  • a priest for 43.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 179
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 10 May 2016