Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso del Galdo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1550BornMedina del Campo, Spain
22 Oct 161262.3AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
6 Oct 161363.3Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
1629¹78.5DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso del Galdo:
Bishop Alfonso del Galdo O.P. (born ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 129, Number 826
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 157
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015