Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de las Cabezas Altamirano

Deceased

Bishop of Arequipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565BornZamora, Spain
15 Apr 160237.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Cuba
19 Jul 161045.5AppointedBishop of Santiago de Guatemala, Guatemala
16 Sep 161550.7AppointedBishop of Arequipa, Peru
19 Dec 161550.9DiedBishop of Arequipa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Juan de las Cabezas Altamirano:
Bishop Juan de las Cabezas Altamirano (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Arequipa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 93, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 199
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 117, Number 746
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015