Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo de Corella (Covella), O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jun 1556AppointedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
31 Mar 1563Ordained BishopBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
31 Jul 1575DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo de Corella (Covella):
Bishop Jerónimo de Corella (Covella) O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Comayagua

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,702
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,818
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 73, Number 428
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015