Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Garin D’Arcey

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1371AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
6 Apr 1371Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
10 Aug 1376DiedBishop of Chartres, France

MicroData Summary for Garin D’Arcey
Bishop Garin D’Arcey (died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast