Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ogier d’Anglure

Deceased

Bishop of Marseille, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Nov 1496AppointedBishop of Marseille, France
26 Feb 1497Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
27 Apr 1506DiedBishop of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Ogier d’Anglure
Bishop Ogier d’Anglure (died ) Bishop of Marseille

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Aix, Archdiocese of Aix

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 187
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 237
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1497, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast