Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Dandini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1509¹Born
14 Nov 154435.8AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
21 Mar 154536.2Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
17 May 154637.3AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
20 Nov 155142.8Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155142.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
11 May 155243.3ResignedBishop of Imola, Italy
25 Oct 155546.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
4 Dec 155950.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Imola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Dandini (VIAF: 12302463)
Girolamo Cardinal Dandini (born 1509, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Imola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesena
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 213
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast