Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Kazimierz Dąmbski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornLubańiec
18 Dec 167335.9AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
1674²36.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm, Poland
19 Oct 167638.7AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
20 Apr 168244.3AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
7 Jul 169254.5AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
30 Mar 170062.2AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
15 Dec 170062.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Kazimierz Dąmbski:
Bishop Stanisław Kazimierz Dąmbski (born 1638, died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156, and Page 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248, and Page 318
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015