Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Engelbert von Dahlen

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1323AppointedBishop of Dorpat (Tartu), Estonia
18 Oct 1341AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
9 Sep 1347DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Engelbert von Dahlen
Archbishop Engelbert von Dahlen (died ) Archbishop of Riga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 472, and Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast