Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ferrier de Abella, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1323¹AppointedArchbishop of Novae Patrae (Neopatrassus, Patrajik), Greece
26 Jun 1323Ordained BishopArchbishop of Novae Patrae (Neopatrassus, Patrajik), Greece
28 Sep 1330AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
30 Aug 1334AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Barcelona, Spain
21 Dec 1344DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferrier de Abella
Archbishop Ferrier de Abella O.P. (died ) Bishop of Barcelona

EventPlace
Ordained BishopAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 362, and Page 332
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast