Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Crivelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1514¹Born
10 Mar 156147.1AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
12 Mar 156551.1Elevated to Cardinal
8 Feb 156652.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
23 Jan 156854.0ResignedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
20 Nov 157056.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
22 Dec 157460.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Crivelli (VIAF: 221111452)
Alessandro Cardinal Crivelli (born 1514, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cariati e Cerenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 202
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 263
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1561, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018