Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Crescenzi

Deceased

Administrator of Conza, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
19 Jan 153434.0AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
2 Jun 154242.4Elevated to Cardinal
6 Nov 154242.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
5 May 154646.3AppointedAdministrator of Conza, Italy
28 May 155252.4DiedAdministrator of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcello Crescenzi (VIAF: 67383437)
Marcello Cardinal Crescenzi (born 1500, died ) Administrator of Conza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona

  • a cardinal for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Jun 1542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236, and Page 175
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,534, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast