Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Coyle

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1728²Born
16 May 177749.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland
16 May 177749.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
14 Sep 177749.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
1782¹54.0SucceededBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
22 Jan 180173.0DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Coyle (VIAF: 41696864)
Bishop Anthony Coyle (born 1728, died ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceListack, near Letterkenny

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265, and Page 352
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 30
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 11 Mar 2019
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast