Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bruno Cosme, M.E.P.

Apostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1962³ Born
1992²29.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jul 199431.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
25 Jul 201956.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia
30 Nov 201956.9InstalledApostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham, Cambodia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bruno Cosme
Father Bruno Cosme M.E.P. (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Kompong-Cham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrance

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Kompong-Cham.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Apr 2020

Quantcast