Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal di Corregio

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511²Born
26 Feb 156150.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jun 156150.4AppointedCardinal-Priest
3 Jun 156150.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
5 May 156251.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
14 May 156857.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
13 May 156958.3AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
22 Jan 157059.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
9 Jun 157059.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
3 Jul 157059.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
9 Oct 157261.7DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo di Corregio (VIAF: 23241937)
Girolamo Cardinal di Corregio (born 1511, died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorregio
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Silvestro nel Quirinale, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 2.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 39, and Page 308
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1570, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018