Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Maurizio Benvenuto Maria Contorni, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1921Born
21 Aug 194019.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
13 Jul 194725.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
25 Nov 198665.2SelectedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
29 Nov 198665.2ConfirmedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
199270.3ResignedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
3 May 199674.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Maurizio Benvenuto Maria Contorni
Abbot Maurizio Benvenuto Maria Contorni O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbadia San Salvatore

  • a priest for 48.8 years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018