Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Luca Collino, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1921Born
29 Jun 194422.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 195029.0ProfessedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Jun 198866.6AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
28 Nov 199675.0RetiredAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
20 Dec 200887.1DiedAbbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Collino
Abbot Luca Collino O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Secondo di Pinerolo

  • a priest for 64.4 years

Source(s):
  • prof: CB, 12 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018