Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Colocci

Deceased

Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1474¹Born
11 Apr 153763.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
1 May 153763.3SucceededBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
27 May 153763.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
1549²75.0DiedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Colocci (VIAF: 27921507)
Bishop Angelo Colocci (born 1474, died 1549) Bishop of Nocera Umbra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018