Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Jude George Cleary, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1926Born
17 Jun 195630.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jul 197549.1SelectedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
4 Nov 197549.4ConfirmedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
1977¹50.6ResignedAbbot of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA
9 Dec 200579.5DiedAbbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians, North Carolina, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jude George Cleary
Abbot Jude George Cleary O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Belmont-Mary Help of Christians

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavannah, GA

  • a priest for 49.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 17 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018