Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís de Cifuentes y Sotomayor, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600²Born
22 Sep 165959.7AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
25 Jul 166060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
18 May 167676.3DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís de Cifuentes y Sotomayor
Bishop Luís de Cifuentes y Sotomayor O.P. (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,432
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,097
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 193, Number 1,210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast