Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Regnault de Chartres

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reims

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio

Administrator of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1380¹BornOns-en-Bray
2 Jan 141434.0AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
4 Mar 143353.2ResignedArchbishop of Reims, France
4 Mar 143353.2AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
4 Apr 143656.3AppointedAdministrator of Agde, France
9 Jan 143959.0AppointedAdministrator of Orléans, France
18 Dec 143960.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144060.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
4 Apr 144464.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reims, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Regnault de Chartres:
Archbishop Regnault de Chartres (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reims

  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 419
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013