Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques du Chatelier (Castellano)

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Feb 1427AppointedBishop of Paris, France
1 Jun 1427Ordained BishopBishop of Paris, France
2 Nov 1438DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques du Chatelier (Castellano)
Bishop Jacques du Chatelier (Castellano) (died ) Bishop of Paris

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Genevieve, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 391
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,742

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast