Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Cesarini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1538AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
3 May 1540Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
1542¹ResignedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Cesarini
Bishop Ascanio Cesarini , Bishop Emeritus of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Ordained Bishoppalais majeur, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 262
  • ob/c23: AT, 15 Dec 2016
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,117
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1540, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 2 Aug 2017