Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Antonio Cerezano Camarena

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1798Born
1821²22.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
27 Jan 186062.0AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
11 Jul 186062.4DiedArchbishop-Elect of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Cerezano Camarena
Father Antonio Cerezano Camarena (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanto Domingo

  • a priest for 39.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1860

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017