Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Ferrer Cassidy, O.P. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Kienow [Jian’ou], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1899Born
21 Jan 193738.0AppointedSuperior of Kienow [Jian’ou], China
8 Jan 193839.0ResignedSuperior of Kienow [Jian’ou], China
21 Nov 197475.8DiedSuperior Emeritus of Kienow [Jian’ou], China

MicroData Summary for William Ferrer Cassidy
Father William Ferrer Cassidy O.P. (born 1899, died ) Superior Emeritus of Kienow [Jian’ou]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUSA

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018